This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2022 at 00:10:56 (UTC).

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM VS JP B

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 WILSHIRE LAW FIRM filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against JP B. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9137

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM

Defendant

B JP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAADIAN BOBBY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/6/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal

12/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Wilshire Law Firm (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wilshire Law Firm (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wilshire Law Firm (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wilshire Law Firm (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less