This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2022 at 00:41:53 (UTC).

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM VS I'M BETTER THEN YOU

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 WILSHIRE LAW FIRM filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against I'M BETTER THEN YOU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9113

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM

Defendant

THEN YOU I'M BETTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAADIAN BOBBY

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/6/2021: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

2/16/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Wilshire Law Firm (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wilshire Law Firm (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wilshire Law Firm (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wilshire Law Firm (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAADIAN BOBBY ESQ.