This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/28/2022 at 09:51:40 (UTC).

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC VS GUARAV SAXENA

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against GUARAV SAXENA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3807

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC

Respondent

SAXENA GUARAV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SAADIAN BOBBY

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/18/2021: Petition - PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Status Conference and Order

5/2/2022: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Request for Dismissal

5/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketOn the Petition filed by WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC on 11/18/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Status of Scheduling Petition to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 07/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC (Petitioner); As to: GUARAV SAXENA (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Status of Scheduling Petition to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 07/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 04/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 11/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketPetition to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC (Petitioner); As to: GUARAV SAXENA (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC (Petitioner); As to: GUARAV SAXENA (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Malcolm Mackey in Department 55 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAADIAN BOBBY ESQ.