This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 03:01:29 (UTC).

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, P.L.C. VS AHMED, FAHAD

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, P L C filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against AHMED, FAHAD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROXAS, ADRIAN GIDAYA and YOUNG, PATRICIA A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6338

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROXAS, ADRIAN GIDAYA

YOUNG, PATRICIA A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM P.L.C.

Respondent

AHMED FAHAD

Other

SAADIAN BABAK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GALPERIN YURY

 

Court Documents

Petition - Workplace Violence (violence) - Petition - Workplace Violence (violence) (Petitions)

9/29/2022: Petition - Workplace Violence (violence) - Petition - Workplace Violence (violence) (Petitions)

Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing - Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Notices)

9/29/2022: Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing - Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Notices)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BABAK SAADIAN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR WORKPLACE VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER (Declarations)

9/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BABAK SAADIAN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR WORKPLACE VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER (Declarations)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment)

9/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment)

Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders)

9/29/2022: Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

9/30/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

9/30/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - Amended

10/10/2022: Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - Amended

Minute Order

10/21/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

11/14/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

11/14/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Amended Proof of Personal Service

12/6/2022: Proof of Service - Amended Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

12/6/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

12/9/2022: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Minute Order

12/9/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service)

12/15/2022: Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 13, Roxas, Adrian Gidaya, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Employee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Amended Proof of Personal Service ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 13, Roxas, Adrian Gidaya, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Amended ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Notices) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence (violence) (Petition - Workplace Violence (violence) (Petitions) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF BABAK SAADIAN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR WORKPLACE VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less