This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2023 at 11:23:11 (UTC).

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, A CALIFORNIA LAW FIRM VS CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, A CALIFORNIA LAW FIRM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2653

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC A CALIFORNIA LAW FIRM

Defendants

CALL TRANSFERS LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

KNIGHT CHANCELLOR R.

MARTINO ALEXANDER PAUL

RODRIGUEZ MARGARITA

SCALING FIRMS INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER DANIEL B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/13/2022: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; ORDE...) OF 04/13/2023

4/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; ORDE...) OF 04/13/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; ORDE...)

4/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; ORDE...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/12/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/12/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/12/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FAI...)

3/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FAI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FAI...) OF 03/01/2023

3/1/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FAI...) OF 03/01/2023

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS CALL TRANSFER, LLC, SCALING FIRMS, INC. AND ALEXANDER PAUL MARTIN

2/14/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS CALL TRANSFER, LLC, SCALING FIRMS, INC. AND ALEXANDER PAUL MARTIN

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DANIEL B. MILLER, ESQ. RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT HEARING ON FEBRUARY 1, 2023

2/14/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DANIEL B. MILLER, ESQ. RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT HEARING ON FEBRUARY 1, 2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)

2/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) OF 02/01/2023

2/1/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) OF 02/01/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR; ORDE...)

12/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR; ORDE...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL B. MILLER, ESQ. RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON NOVEMBER 14, 2022 AND RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL B. MILLER, ESQ. RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON NOVEMBER 14, 2022 AND RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/14/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/14/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE AMENDED

12/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE AMENDED

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

12/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Entry of Judgment scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Entry of Judgment scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/02/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Entry of Judgment; Orde...): Status Date changed from 04/13/2023 to 04/13/2023 ; Name Extension changed from (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Entry of Judgment; Orde...) to (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Entry of Judgment; Orde...) ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Entry of Judgment; Orde...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Entry of Judgment; Orde...) of 04/13/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: sanctions for Plaintiff's counsel failure to appear scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 04/13/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm (Plaintiff); As to: CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company; On the Complaint filed by WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm on 07/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm (Plaintiff); As to: SCALING FIRMS, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm (Plaintiff); As to: Alexander Paul Martino (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm (Plaintiff); As to: CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); SCALING FIRMS, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Alexander Paul Martino (Defendant) et al. Service Date: 07/20/2022; Service Cost: 219.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm (Plaintiff); As to: CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); SCALING FIRMS, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Alexander Paul Martino (Defendant) et al. Service Date: 07/20/2022; Service Cost: 219.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 26 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm (Plaintiff); As to: CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); SCALING FIRMS, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Alexander Paul Martino (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm (Plaintiff); As to: CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); SCALING FIRMS, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Alexander Paul Martino (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm (Plaintiff); As to: CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); SCALING FIRMS, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Alexander Paul Martino (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******2653 Hearing Date: April 13, 2023 Dept: 26

Prior to the April 12, 2023 OSC re entry of default judgment, Plaintiff must correct the following defects with its default judgment package:



Case Number: *******2653 Hearing Date: April 12, 2023 Dept: 26

*******2653

Prior to the April 12, 2023 OSC re entry of default judgment, Plaintiff must correct the following defects with its default judgment package:

- The CIV-100 form submitted by the moving party failed to complete the declaration of non-military status (item eight on the form) and the memorandum of costs (item 7 on the form). Plaintiff must file a new CIV-100 form that properly completes both sections and sign the CIV-100 form.

- Plaintiff has failed to file a request for dismissal of all unnamed defendants, Does 1-50. Plaintiff must immediately file a request for dismissal of all unnamed defendants, Does 1-50.