This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 11:11:35 (UTC).

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, A CALIFORNIA LAW FIRM VS CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, A CALIFORNIA LAW FIRM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2653

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC A CALIFORNIA LAW FIRM

Defendants

CALL TRANSFERS LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

KNIGHT CHANCELLOR R.

MARTINO ALEXANDER PAUL

RODRIGUEZ MARGARITA

SCALING FIRMS INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER DANIEL B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/13/2022: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FAI...)

3/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FAI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FAI...) OF 03/01/2023

3/1/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FAI...) OF 03/01/2023

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS CALL TRANSFER, LLC, SCALING FIRMS, INC. AND ALEXANDER PAUL MARTIN

2/14/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS CALL TRANSFER, LLC, SCALING FIRMS, INC. AND ALEXANDER PAUL MARTIN

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DANIEL B. MILLER, ESQ. RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT HEARING ON FEBRUARY 1, 2023

2/14/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DANIEL B. MILLER, ESQ. RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT HEARING ON FEBRUARY 1, 2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)

2/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) OF 02/01/2023

2/1/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) OF 02/01/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR; ORDE...)

12/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR; ORDE...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL B. MILLER, ESQ. RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON NOVEMBER 14, 2022 AND RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL B. MILLER, ESQ. RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON NOVEMBER 14, 2022 AND RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/14/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/14/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE AMENDED

12/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE AMENDED

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

12/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

12/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AMENDED

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/14/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 11/14/2022

11/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 11/14/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

11/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/10/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • Hearing04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • Hearing04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for Plaintiff's counsel failure to appear

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Entry of Judgment scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: sanctions for Plaintiff's counsel failure to appear scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for Plaintiff's counsel failure to appear scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/13/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Entry of Judgment scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/13/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for Plaintiff's counsel fai...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for Plaintiff's counsel fai...) of 03/01/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS CALL TRANSFER, LLC, SCALING FIRMS, INC. AND ALEXANDER PAUL MARTINO; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF DANIEL B. MILLER, ESQ. RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT HEARING ON FEBRUARY 1, 2023; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm (Plaintiff); As to: CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); SCALING FIRMS, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Alexander Paul Martino (Defendant) et al. Service Date: 07/20/2022; Service Cost: 219.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm (Plaintiff); As to: CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); SCALING FIRMS, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Alexander Paul Martino (Defendant) et al. Service Date: 07/20/2022; Service Cost: 219.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 26 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm (Plaintiff); As to: CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); SCALING FIRMS, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Alexander Paul Martino (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm (Plaintiff); As to: CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); SCALING FIRMS, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Alexander Paul Martino (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, PLC, a California law firm (Plaintiff); As to: CALL TRANSFERS, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company (Defendant); SCALING FIRMS, INC., a Nevada Corporation (Defendant); Alexander Paul Martino (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less