This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2022 at 08:47:58 (UTC).

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION VS MIKE M.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 WILSHIRE LAW FIRM, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against MIKE M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5869

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

Defendant

MIKE M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAADIAN BOBBY

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/29/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/18/2022

2/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/18/2022

Case Management Statement

2/17/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

3/28/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Wilshire Law Firm, a Professional Law Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Docketat 11:45 AM in Department 19; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference) of 02/18/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Wilshire Law Firm, a Professional Law Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wilshire Law Firm, a Professional Law Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wilshire Law Firm, a Professional Law Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wilshire Law Firm, a Professional Law Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAADIAN BOBBY ESQ.