Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2019 at 00:26:07 (UTC).

WILSHIRE ESCROW COMPANY VS DAWSON AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 WILSHIRE ESCROW COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against DAWSON AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DALILA CORRAL LYONS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1038

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DALILA CORRAL LYONS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WILSHIRE ESCROW COMPANY

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

DAWSON AUTOMOTIVE GROUP LLC

COVINA MJL

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

SAGE COVINA CHEVROLET

MJL COVINA

CHEVROLET SAGE COVINA

COVINA MJL LLC DBA SAGE COVINA CHEVROLET A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Cross Defendants

COVINA MJL LLC

COVINA MJL LLC DBA SAGE COVINA CHEVROLET A CALIFORNIA LLC

Not Classified By Court and Respondents

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

CHEVROLET SAGE COVINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WHITMAN SCOTT L. ESQ.

WHITMAN SCOTT L ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

TARLOW DAVID NATHAN

BLUMENFELD ORI S.

MANN JEFF

 

Court Documents

Unknown

4/9/2019: Unknown

Answer

3/26/2019: Answer

Stipulation

2/27/2019: Stipulation

Notice

2/26/2019: Notice

Minute Order

3/1/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

2/21/2019: Unknown

Notice

2/13/2019: Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

1/24/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order

1/25/2019: Minute Order

Notice

2/4/2019: Notice

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE - IC

9/11/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE - IC

COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

9/11/2018: COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

Unknown

9/11/2018: Unknown

Notice of Related Case

10/11/2018: Notice of Related Case

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

9/26/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/26/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF ADVANCED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

10/2/2018: NOTICE OF ADVANCED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • Request for Dismissal ((Partial) With Prejudice Entire Action as to Cross-Complaint filed 1/30/19); Filed by Dawson Automotive Group, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • at 3:00 PM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (of Cross-Complainant's Post-Mediattion Status Report and a Notice of Related Case (cross-reference to case numberBC579623))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • at 2:52 PM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order Rejecting Cross-Complainant Dawson Automotive Gro...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Rejecting Cross-Complainant Dawson Automotive Gro...) of 06/17/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (of the Cross-Complaint filed on January 30, 2019) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • at 09:10 AM in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:) of 04/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Minute Order ((COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE - IC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS WITH COURT PER COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER, WITH RESERVATION OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Wilshire Escrow Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Wilshire Escrow Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Wilshire Escrow Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TARLOW DAVID N.