This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 02:30:26 (UTC).

WILSHIRE EQUITY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CORP VS DIANE HWAN JUNG CHO

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 WILSHIRE EQUITY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CORP filed an Other lawsuit against DIANE HWAN JUNG CHO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9568

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSHIRE EQUITY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CORP

Defendants

CHO DIANE HWAN JUNG

CHO DIANE HEE JUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN REBECCA HUFFORD

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/2/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/9/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Unknown - VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE

9/9/2021: Unknown - VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/9/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/15/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

9/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/15/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/17/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

9/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

9/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

9/30/2021: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

10/22/2021: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Declaration for Default Judgment by Court (Unlawful Detainer)

10/22/2021: Declaration for Default Judgment by Court (Unlawful Detainer)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- PARTIAL); Filed by Wilshire Equity Property Management Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Wilshire Equity Property Management Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Wilshire Equity Property Management Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration for Default Judgment by Court (Unlawful Detainer); Filed by Wilshire Equity Property Management Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by Wilshire Equity Property Management Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Wilshire Equity Property Management Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Wilshire Equity Property Management Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint (1st)); Filed by Wilshire Equity Property Management Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wilshire Equity Property Management Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Wilshire Equity Property Management Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint (- 1st Amended); Filed by Wilshire Equity Property Management Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Diane Hwan Jung Cho)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wilshire Equity Property Management Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wilshire Equity Property Management Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Wilshire Equity Property Management Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wilshire Equity Property Management Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE EQUITY PROPERTY MANGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF REBECCA HUFFORD-COHEN - REBECCA HUFFORD-COHEN