This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 00:02:03 (UTC).

WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SOLELY IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE HOLDERS OF THE GS MORTGAGE S VS PLAZA WEST COVINA LP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SOLELY IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE HOLDERS OF THE GS MORTGAGE S filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PLAZA WEST COVINA LP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4082

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SOLELY IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE HOLDERS OF THE GS MORTGAGE SECURITIES CORPORATION TRUST 2018-SRP5 COMMERCIAL MORTGAGE PASSTHROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2018-SRP5

WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

PLAZA WEST COVINA LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

PLAZA WEST COVINA LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDIS RYAN

Defendant Attorney

HARRISON STACY W.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS ACTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO REQUEST DISMISSAL

7/29/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS ACTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO REQUEST DISMISSAL

Case Management Statement

1/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

1/19/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/25/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAZA WEST COVINA LP TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

12/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAZA WEST COVINA LP TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAZA WEST COVINA LP TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/26/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAZA WEST COVINA LP TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAZA WEST COVINA LP TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/26/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAZA WEST COVINA LP TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE

10/29/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER]

10/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER]

Proof of Personal Service

9/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/21/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Action and [proposed] Order To Request Dismissal); Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Plaza West Covina LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaza West Covina LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaza West Covina LP to Respond to Complaint); Filed by Plaza West Covina LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint); Filed by Plaza West Covina LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order ([Proposed] Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaza West Covina LP to Respond to Complaint and to Continue Case Management Conference); Filed by Plaza West Covina LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Appointment of Receiver) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Ex Parte Application Notice of Ex Parte Application for Appointment of Receiver]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLAZA WEST COVINA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY, BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRISON STACY WEINSTEIN