This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2022 at 15:18:49 (UTC).

WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR INDENTURE TRUSTEE TO CITIBANK, N.A., AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE OF SACO I TRUS VS DAVID ROSARIO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS SUCCESSOR INDENTURE TRUSTEE TO CITIBANK, N A , AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE OF SACO I TRUS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DAVID ROSARIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1039

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS SUCCESSOR INDENTURE TRUSTEE TO CITIBANK N.A. AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE OF SACO I TRUST 2006-12 MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES SERIES 2006-12

Defendants

ROSARIO DAVID

ZIONS BANCORPORATION N.A. AKA CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZUBERI NABEEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/9/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Lis Pendens

8/9/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

8/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Dismissal

9/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

11/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Order for Publication

10/22/2021: Order for Publication

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO SERVE VIA PUBLICATION

10/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION TO SERVE VIA PUBLICATION

Application for Publication

10/18/2021: Application for Publication

Proof of Publication

1/4/2022: Proof of Publication

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • Hearing04/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Indenture Trustee to Citibank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee of Saco I Trust 2006-12, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2006-12 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Indenture Trustee to Citibank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee of Saco I Trust 2006-12, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2006-12 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketOrder for Publication; Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Indenture Trustee to Citibank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee of Saco I Trust 2006-12, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2006-12 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketApplication for Publication; Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Indenture Trustee to Citibank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee of Saco I Trust 2006-12, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2006-12 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (in support of Application to Serve via Publication); Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Indenture Trustee to Citibank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee of Saco I Trust 2006-12, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2006-12 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Indenture Trustee to Citibank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee of Saco I Trust 2006-12, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2006-12 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Indenture Trustee to Citibank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee of Saco I Trust 2006-12, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2006-12 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Indenture Trustee to Citibank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee of Saco I Trust 2006-12, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2006-12 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Indenture Trustee to Citibank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee of Saco I Trust 2006-12, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2006-12 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Indenture Trustee to Citibank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee of Saco I Trust 2006-12, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2006-12 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Indenture Trustee to Citibank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee of Saco I Trust 2006-12, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2006-12 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Successor Indenture Trustee to Citibank, N.A., as Indenture Trustee of Saco I Trust 2006-12, Mortgage-Backed Notes, Series 2006-12 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZIONS BANCORPORATION N.A. DBA CALIFORNIA BANK & TRUST FKA ZB N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY, BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZUBERI, NABEEL M