*******1953
11/21/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Other
Los Angeles, California
THOMAS C. FALLS
PETER A. HERNANDEZ
VASQUEZ WILMA
LOS ANGELES NURSING HOMES LLC
PACIFIC HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS INC.
POMONA HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER LLC
POMONA NURSING AND HEALTHCARE CENTRE LLC
RECHNITZ SHLOMO
ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC
GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL
COWDREY SEAN D.
3/24/2023: Notice of Settlement
3/24/2023: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
3/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)
3/16/2023: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGABLE OF ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC
3/9/2023: Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC
3/6/2023: Motion for Summary Adjudication
3/6/2023: Separate Statement
3/6/2023: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES AGAINST DEFENDANT POMONA HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER, LLC
3/6/2023: Separate Statement
3/6/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VALERIE GRAY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION
3/6/2023: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
3/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT APPOINT A DISCOVER...)
3/2/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES
3/2/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICFE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINITFS MOTION TO COMPEL
3/1/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE PRODUCTION OF WITNESSES FOR DEPOSITION AND TRIAL AND PROPOSED ORDER
2/28/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
2/27/2023: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANT ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLCS OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO COMPEL
2/27/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS
Hearing06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Wilma Vasquez (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties:
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketHearing on Motion to Quash Overbroad Business Records Subpoenas scheduled for 08/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/24/2023
[-] Read LessDocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/24/2023
[-] Read LessDocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 08/02/2023 at 10:00 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/24/2023
[-] Read LessDocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 08/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/24/2023
[-] Read LessDocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 07/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/24/2023
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas C. Falls in Department R Pomona Courthouse South
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department R
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department R
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Wilma Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Shlomo Rechnitz (Defendant); Rockport Administrative Services, LLC (Defendant); Pomona Nursing And Healthcare Centre, LLC (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wilma Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Shlomo Rechnitz (Defendant); Rockport Administrative Services, LLC (Defendant); Pomona Nursing And Healthcare Centre, LLC (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Status Date changed from 12/01/2022 to 11/21/2022
[-] Read LessCase Number: *******1953 Hearing Date: March 20, 2023 Dept: O
HEARING DATE: Monday, March 20, 2023
RE: WILMA VASQUEZ vs SHLOMO RECHNITZ, et al (*******1953)
PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC
Responding Party: Defendants ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC; POMONA NURSING AND HEALTHCARE CENTRE, LLC; LOS ANGELES NURSING HOMES, LLC; PACIFIC HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, INC.; and POMONA HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER, LLC (“Opposing Defendants”)
Tentative Ruling
PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC is GRANTED in part (i.e., Defendants produce responsive documents for requests Nos. 1-3) and DENIED in part (i.e., as to deposition of PMK). Request No. 4 is modified. As for monetary sanctions, the court declines to impose monetary sanctions.
Background
This matter arises from an alleged elder abuse. Plaintiff WILMA VASQUEZ alleges that she was admitted to Defendants’ facility from Casa Colina on October 14, 2022. Upon admission to the facility, Plaintiff suffered from Thyroid issues that required a tracheostomy and trachea tube, which requires regular catheter suctioning to maintain a clear airway. However, due to Defendants’ alleged failures to use the correct catheter suction, to assess throat trauma, and to advise the physician of blood clots being suctioned from her trachea tube, on November 3, 2022, Plaintiff was found unresponsive. As a result, Plaintiff “suffered [a] gruesome injury . . . extreme and unnecessary pain and suffering, loss of personal dignity, shame and humiliation, degradation, anguish and emotional trauma.” (Complaint 42.)
On November 21, 2022, Plaintiff filed suit against Defendants SHLOMO RECHNITZ; ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, POMONA NURSING AND HEALTHCARE CENTRE, LLC; LOS ANGELES NURSING HOMES, LLC; PACIFIC HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, INC.; and POMONA HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER, LLC for (1) Dependent Adult Abuse (Pursuant to the Elder Adult and Dependent Adult Civil Protection Act – Welfare and Institutions Code 15600, et seq.) 2) Negligence.
On February 3, 2023, the court denied Plaintiff’s Motion For Trial Preference Pursuant To California Code Of Civil Procedure 36.
On February 1, 2023, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion.
On February 22, 2023, Defendants filed their Opposition.
On February 27, 2023, Plaintiff filed its Reply.
There is an OSC regarding why a discovery referee should not be appointed on calendar for 6/26.
Discussion
Plaintiff seeks to compel the deposition of Defendants’ PMK because Defendants refused to produce and failed to appear at the lawfully served notice deposition scheduled for February 1, 2023. (Motion p. 1.)
In Opposition, Defendants explain that narrative is inaccurate: On February 14, 2023 (after scheduling conflicts) the deposition of the PMK of Pomona Healthcare & Wellness, LLC went forward. (Opp. p. 3.) As for the request for production, Defendants state that they maintain their asserted objections.
Here, as for the PMK, the court agrees with Defendants that it is unwarranted to produce the PMK for a second time. In fact, though Plaintiff’s Reply references the February 14, 2023 deposition, it does not expressly acknowledge the fact that its motion is predicated upon a different factual scenario (i.e., motion states a PMK was not produced whereas a PMK was produced).
Therefore, as persons previously deposed may not be deposed again (absent a court order based on a showing of good cause),[1] Plaintiff’s motion is denied as to the second deposition of the PMK.
As for documents 1,[2] 2,[3] 3,[4] and 4[5]—which form the basis of the Separate Statement—Defendants aver that they asserted no objections to requests 1, 2, and 3. However, a review of Defendants’ own separate statement indicates that they did assert objections based upon evidence code 1157, attorney-client privilege and third parties’ privacy rights. And to the extent that they did assert objections, the court agrees with Plaintiff that they are boilerplate objections (i.e., pages of case law without an analysis). As for request #3, the Separate Statement indicates that no response was provided.
Therefore, as Defendants bear the burden in maintaining the asserted objections (based on privilege, work product, and privacy) which they failed to do so and as Defendants failed to produce the documents pertinent to request number 3, the court GRANTS the production of documents 1, 2, and 3.
As for request for production #4, Defendants aver that it is vague and ambiguous as to the term “ensure.” And that the language is not particularized as to not include documents that are irrelevant or would infringe on privacy rights. More specifically, Defendants’ separate statement states that “[u]ntil plaintiff makes a showing of which specific employee was negligent in providing care to plaintiff resulting in the alleged injury to plaintiff, that the requested employee documents are directly relevant to this case, and that the need for these documents outweighs the specific employee’s right to privacy in the records” relying upon Puerto v. Superior Court (2008) 158 Cal.App.4th 1242, 1251.) However, Puerto is inapposite because it involved a claim of wage and hour violations, causes of action which do not require a showing of gross negligence, recklessness, or other measures of intent.[6] Here, however, the claims are for elder abuse violations, which requires a showing that the “employer had advance knowledge of the unfitness of the employee and employed him or her with a conscious disregard of the rights or safety of others or authorized or ratified the wrongful conduct for which the damages are awarded or was personally guilty of oppression, fraud, or malice.” (Civil Code 3294(b).) That said, the discovery request is overly broad as it seeks personnel records for all persons even if they did not treat Plaintiff. Accordingly, request #4 is modified to allow the discovery of personnel record only for the employees that treated Plaintiff during her stay. Request No. 4 is also subject to a mutually agreed upon protective order. Therefore, as the inquiry is relevant as to the issue of punitive damages, the court provisionally GRANTS the request as to #4, subject to the stated modification and protective order.
Conclusion
Based on the foregoing, the motion is GRANTED in part (i.e., Defendants produce responsive documents for requests 1-3) and DENIED in part (i.e., as to deposition of PMK). Request No. 4 is modified and subject to a protective order.
As for monetary sanctions, the court declines to impose monetary sanctions.
[1] CCP section 2025.610
[2] All DOCUMENTS exchanged between YOU and the FACILITY during the time period of May 1, 2022 through December 3, 2022 which reference in whatsoever manner FACILITY staffing, census, interaction with the Department of Public Health, budgets, and/or the provision of NURSING SERVICES in the FACILITY. (The names of all residents other than the PLAINTIFF should be redacted from the production.)
[3] All DOCUMENTS made available between YOU and the FACILITY during the time period of May 1, 2022 through December 3, 2022 which reference in whatsoever manner FACILITY staffing, census, interaction with the Department of Public Health, budgets, and/or the provision of NURSING SERVICES in the FACILITY. (The names of all residents other than the PLAINTIFF should be redacted from the production.)
[4] All DOCUMENTS consisting of any management agreement, professional services agreement and/or consulting agreement between the FACILITY and the deponent which was in effect during the residency of the PLAINTIFF in the FACILITY.
[5] All DOCUMENTS reflecting efforts by YOU to ensure that the FACILITY Administrator and Director of Nursing of the FACILITY was fit to perform his or her job duties with the FACILITY during the residency of the PLAINTIFF in the FACILITY. (For purposes of these inquiries, YOU and YOUR refers individually and collectively to the defendant to whom this request is addressed and all persons acting or purporting to act on the behalf of said defendant.)
[6] “Recklessness, unlike negligence, involves more than ‘inadvertence, incompetence, unskillfulness, or a failure to take precautions’ but rather rises to the level of ‘conscious choice of a course of action . . . with knowledge of the serious danger to others involved in it.’” (See Delaney at p. 31-32.) In order to obtain the [EADACPA’s] heightened remedies, a plaintiff must allege conduct essentially equivalent to conduct that would support recovery of punitive damages. (Compare Welf & Inst. Code, 15657 [requiring ‘clear and convincing evidence that a defendant is liable for’ elder abuse and ‘has been guilty of recklessness, oppression, fraud, or malice in the commission of the abuse’] with Civ. Code, 3294, subd. (a) [requiring ‘clear and convincing evidence’ that the defendant has been guilty of oppression, fraud or malice].) (See Covenant Care at p. 789.) Thus, “a health care provider sued for violating the [EADACPA] must defend against allegations of egregious conduct.” (Id. at p. 787.)
Case Number: *******1953 Hearing Date: February 3, 2023 Dept: O
HEARING DATE: Friday, February 3, 2023
RE: WILMA VASQUEZ vs SHLOMO RECHNITZ, et al (*******1953)
PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE (“Motion”) PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 36
Responding Party: Defendants ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC; POMONA NURSING AND HEALTHCARE CENTRE, LLC; LOS ANGELES NURSING HOMES, LLC; PACIFIC HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, INC.; and POMONA HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER, LLC (“Opposing Defendants”)
Tentative Ruling
PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 36 is DENIED.
Background
This matter arises from an alleged elder abuse. Plaintiff WILMA VASQUEZ alleges that she was admitted to Defendants’ facility from Casa Colina on October 14, 2022. Upon admission to the facility, Plaintiff suffered from Thyroid issues that required a tracheostomy and trachea tube, which requires regular catheter suctioning to maintain a clear airway. However, due to Defendants’ alleged failures to use the correct catheter suction, to assess throat trauma, and to advise the physician of blood clots being suctioned from her trachea tube, on November 3, 2022, Plaintiff was found unresponsive. As a result, Plaintiff “suffered [a] gruesome injury . . . extreme and unnecessary pain and suffering, loss of personal dignity, shame and humiliation, degradation, anguish and emotional trauma.” (Complaint 42.)
On November 21, 2022, Plaintiff filed suit against Defendants SHLOMO RECHNITZ; ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, POMONA NURSING AND HEALTHCARE CENTRE, LLC; LOS ANGELES NURSING HOMES, LLC; PACIFIC HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS, INC.; and POMONA HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTER, LLC for (1) Dependent Adult Abuse (Pursuant to the Elder Adult and Dependent Adult Civil Protection Act – Welfare and Institutions Code 15600, et seq.) 2) Negligence.
On December 5, 2022, Plaintiff filed the instant motion.
On December 8, 2022, Plaintiff served the summons and complaint upon the opposing Defendants.
On January 9, 2023, Opposing Defendants filed their Answer.
On January 11, 2023, Plaintiff’s Order for Publication was granted as to Defendant Shlomo Rechnitz.
On January 23, 2023, Opposing Defendants filed their Opposition to the Motion.
On January 26, 2023, Plaintiff filed its Reply.
Legal Standard
Plaintiff moves for trial preference based on CCP section 36 subdivision (d). (Motion p. 1.)
For litigants who are not over the age of 70, the court retains discretion pursuant to CCP section 36(d).[1] The statute provides that “[i]n its discretion, the court may also grant a motion for preference that is accompanied by clear and convincing medical documentation that concludes that one of the parties suffers from an illness or condition raising substantial medical doubt of survival of that party beyond six months, and that satisfies the court that the interests of justice will be served by granting the preference.” (CCP 36(d)) (emphasis added).
Discussion
Plaintiff moves for trial preference because Plaintiff is “bedbound, morbidly obese 54-year-old woman with a medical history of respiratory failure, obesity related alveolar hypoventilation syndrome, +1 edema, hypothyroidism, hypertension, congestive heart failure, diabetes, asthma, obstructive sleep apnea on CPAP, severe hypercapnia, depression, GERD, kidney disease, severe weakness, history of intubation and a history of trachea.” (Motion p. 1.) Based on her health conditions, Plaintiff’s expert, Dr. Shahab Attarchi, has “determined that Wilma Vasquez suffers from health conditions such that to a reasonable degree of medical certainty there exists substantial medical doubt of Wilma Vasquez’s survival beyond six months.” (Motion p. 1.)
In opposition, Opposing Defendants advance the following arguments: (1) Defendant Shlomo has not yet been served with the complaint; (2) Dr. Attarchi’s declaration is conclusory; and (3) Defendants would be severely prejudiced.
Here, the court agrees with the Opposing Defendants on all three points.
First, Plaintiff in its Reply does not dispute that Defendant Shlomo has not been served but effectively argues that the delay in service is justified because Shlomo was evading service. Whether he has been evading service is irrelevant to notice requirements. Putting aside the concern with a violation of Defendant Shlomo’s due process rights for Plaintiff’s failure to yet serve him with the summons and complaint, CCP section 36(c)(1) requires that the moving party “file and serve a motion for preference supported by a declaration of the moving party that all essential parties have been served with process or have appeared.” Here, however, Plaintiff has provided no such declaration. And to the extent that case law allows for Plaintiff to circumvent this requirement, Plaintiff has proffered no legal authority in its Reply. Therefore, for this reason alone, the motion is denied.
Second, a review of Dr. Attarchi’s declaration does not provide any medical reporting (i.e., the facts to lay the foundation) nor an explanation of how Plaintiff’s numerous health conditions (e.g., increase risk of cardiac event, unintentional weight loss, worsening edema, etc.) will likely cause her to not live beyond the next 6 months. Rather, Dr. Attarchi’s declaration conclusively states that Plaintiff suffers from certain health conditions and said certain health conditions place a patient for a high risk of “debility and death.” To the extent that Plaintiff relies on Dr. Attarchi’s accurate prediction in 30 other cases, that is inconsequential for numerous reasons including, but not limited to, the fact that Plaintiff does not state how many other individuals Dr. Attarchi has assessed (i.e., perhaps he examined 1,000 patients, but only 30 times of which he has been correct) nor does Plaintiff not state whether those individuals had a similar medical history to Plaintiff. Therefore, as Dr. Attarchi’s declaration is conclusory, it is insufficient to meet the clear and convincing evidentiary standard.[2]
Third, as for prejudice, granting trial preference would give Defendants only 42 days to conduct discovery for a summary judgment/adjudication motion.[3] Forty-two days to serve and receive responses to discovery, set and take depositions, and then prepare the summary judgment motion is not only impractical but impossible.[4] And contrary to Plaintiff’s contention that “Defendants are already in possession of the facts and records” such that it is Plaintiff who requires more time to conjure evidence, that is inaccurate as a matter of law in malpractice actions like this one. In medical malpractice actions, a plaintiff must prove the defendant's negligence was a cause-in-fact of injury. (Bromme v. Pavitt (1992) 5 Cal.App.4th 1487, 1502.) “The law is well settled that in a personal injury action causation must be proven within a reasonable medical probability based [on] competent expert testimony.” (Jones v. Ortho Pharmaceutical Corp. (1985) 163 Cal.App.3d 396, 402–403.) Therefore, both parties need extensive time to conduct discovery on a summary judgment motion. Next, to the extent that Plaintiff avers that “the legislature of the state and the court hold that the inconvenience to the parties may not be considered by the Court in analyzing this motion,” that is an inaccurate representation of the law. (Reply p. 8.) In fact, a critical factor which the court must consider in ruling on a such a motion is any prejudice to the defendant resulting from the accelerated trial date. (Dick v. Superior Court (1986) 185 Cal.App.3d 1159, 1166, see also Opp. p. 7.) Lastly, to the extent that Plaintiff argues it is Defendants who have delayed starting discovery despite “ample time to do so,” this is disingenuous to both the timeline of the case and normal sequencing of events in litigation considering that Defendants were merely served with the summons and complaint on December 8, 2022. (See Reply pp. 4, 8.)
All in all, the decision to grant or deny a preferential trial setting rests in the discretion of the court in light of the totality of the circumstances. (Salas v. Sears, Roebuck & Co. (1986) 42 Cal.3d 342, 344.) And here, the totality of the circumstances—circumstances such as that (i) Opposing Defendants’ were but recently served, (ii) one individual Defendant has yet to be served, (iii) Plaintiff’s expert did not by clear and convincing evidence establish that Plaintiff will not survive beyond the next six months, (iv) that no discovery has yet to be conducted in the action and setting a trial preference would inherently deprive Defendants’ of their statutory right to file a summary judgment motion—the court finds more prejudice to opposing Defendants than to Plaintiff.
Conclusion
Based on the foregoing, the motion for trial preference is DENIED.
[1] As such, Plaintiff’s contention that section 36 is mandatory and absolute is incorrect as a matter of law. (Motion p. 8.) To the extent that trial preference is mandatory, that pertains to litigants over the age of 70. (See Code of Civil Procedure 36 (a) [A party to a civil action who is over the age of 70 must be given preference if the party has a substantial interest in the action as a whole, and the health of the party is such that a preference is necessary to prevent prejudicing the party’s interest in the litigation.].) Therefore, the court’s determination rests on its discretion.
[2] Though a summary judgment motion is different than a trial preference motion, a summary judgment motion has a lesser evidentiary burden than that of a trial preference motion because the latter requires clear and convincing evidence, such that reference to summary judgment evidentiary requirements would be helpful in assessing the admissibility of Dr. Attarchi’s evidence. In summary judgment motions, the expert's opinion must rest on a sound evidentiary foundation. “Cases dismissing expert declarations in connection with summary judgment motions do so on the basis that the declarations established that the opinions were either speculative, lacked foundation, or were stated without sufficient certainty . . . It is sufficient, if an expert declaration establishes the matters relied upon in expressing the opinion, that the opinion rests on matters of a type reasonably relied upon, and the bases for the opinion.”] (Sanchez v. Hillerich & Bradsby Co. (2002) 104 Cal.App.4th 703, 718, see also Kelley v. Trunk (1998) 66 Cal.App.4th 519, 524, [The expert opinions offered by the defendant in support of summary judgment must be supported by reasons based upon evidentiary facts, not bare conclusions without explanation or analysis.]) (emphasis added). Furthermore, if the record lacks independent evidence of a patient's treatment history, the expert may not establish those facts simply by describing or relating the contents of medical records on which he or she relied to form an opinion. (Garibay v. Hemmat (2008) 161 Cal.App.4th 735, 743.) Expert declarations may be based on hospital and medical records if they are properly authenticated. (Ibid.)
[3] As explained by Defendants, if this court grants plaintiff’s motion for trial preference on February 3, 2023, the court will be required to set trial within 120 days, i.e., June 2, 2023. But motions for summary judgment/adjudication must be heard no later than 30 days before trial and must be served at least 75 days before the hearing. (Code of Civil Procedure 437c(a).) As such, if the court sets trial for June 2, 2023, defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication will need to be heard no later than May 3, 2023 and personally served no later than March 17, 2023. (Opp. p. 7.)
[4] And equally so even if the court schedules the hearing on the summary judgment less than 30 days prior to the trial. (Code of Civil Procedure 437c(a).)