This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2020 at 08:42:09 (UTC).

WILLY MATHURIN VS CURTIS JELKS ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/09/2018 WILLY MATHURIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CURTIS JELKS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1350

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MATHURIN WILLY

Defendants and Respondents

ANDREWS INTERNATIONAL INC.

JELKS CURTIS

JONES A.

DOES 1 TO 10

HARRIS G.

JONES A.ERRONEOUSLY SUED

HARRIS GERRY

JONES ANTOINE

HARRIS G. ERRONEOUSLY SUED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ONWAEZE OGOCHUKWU VICTOR ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

8/17/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

8/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 04/22/2020

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 04/22/2020

Proof of Personal Service

12/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/4/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Ruling

11/12/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/25/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/27/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING THE CL...)

11/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING THE CL...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/7/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

10/11/2019: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/11/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

10/11/2019: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER DIRE...)

10/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER DIRE...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF THE COURT TO ENTER THE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT ANDREWS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

10/9/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF THE COURT TO ENTER THE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT ANDREWS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/23/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/23/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Legacy Document -

10/2/2018: Legacy Document -

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • Hearing04/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Hearing01/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment) of 08/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Ogochukwu Victor Onwaeze, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Plaintiff Willy Mathurin in Support of Entry of Judgement); Filed by Willy Mathurin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of 04/22/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Willy Mathurin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Willy Mathurin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Willy Mathurin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Willy Mathurin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Willy Mathurin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR 1. ASSAULT ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701350    Hearing Date: November 05, 2019    Dept: 2

Mathurin v. Jelks, et al.

Plaintiff’s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing the Clerk of the Court to Enter the Default of Defendant, Andrews International, Inc. filed on 10/9/19 is GRANTED. The clerk is ordered to enter the default of Defendant, Andrews International, Inc., forthwith.

Plaintiff may serve a surrendered corporation with summons and complaint by personally serving the Secretary of State, who then transmits the documents to the defendant by mail. A court order is expressly not required to complete service in this manner. Corp. Code, § 2114

Defendant filed a Certificate of Surrender with the California Secretary of State on 12/15/17. Application, Ex. 2. Plaintiff personally served the Secretary of State with the summons and complaint for transmittal to Defendant. Application, Ex. 3.

The Secretary of State confirmed that it forwarded the summons and complaint to the Defendant on 4/25/19. Application, Ex. 3.

Plaintiff complied with Cal Code Civil Procedure § 2114 to complete service of process on Defendant.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.