This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2023 at 07:12:59 (UTC).

WILLIE HARLSTON, BY AND THROUGH HIS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, TRICKINA HARLSTON, ET AL. VS GERI CARE IV, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 WILLIE HARLSTON, BY AND THROUGH HIS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, TRICKINA HARLSTON, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GERI CARE IV, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL C. KELLEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0296

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARLSTON TRICKINA

TRICKINA HARLSTON WILLIE HARLSTON BY AND THROUGH HIS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

Defendants

GERI CARE IV LLC DBA ANTELOPE VALLEY CARE CENTER

UNIFIED CARE SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELDMAN SARA MICHELLE

Defendant Attorney

PHLEGER DAWN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/20/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Continuance

4/14/2023: Notice of Continuance

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/12/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

10/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/7/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

8/4/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/2/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

8/1/2022: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

7/22/2022: Request for Dismissal

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

6/27/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

6/27/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer

6/24/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/29/2022: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRICKINA HARLSTON

4/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRICKINA HARLSTON

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/21/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/21/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Willie Harlston, by and through his Successor in Interest, Trickina Harlston, et al. on 04/29/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Willie Harlston, by and through his Successor in Interest, Trickina Harlston and Trickina Harlston as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Willie Harlston, by and through his Successor in Interest, Trickina Harlston (Plaintiff); Trickina Harlston (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023

DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by: Willie Harlston, by and through his Successor in Interest, Trickina Harlston (Plaintiff); Trickina Harlston (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 05/30/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/08/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022

DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Sara Michelle Feldman (Attorney)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
05/02/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department A15 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2022

DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Management Conference]; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2022

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Willie Harlston, by and through his Successor in Interest, Trickina Harlston (Plaintiff); Trickina Harlston (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2022

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Willie Harlston, by and through his Successor in Interest, Trickina Harlston (Plaintiff); Trickina Harlston (Plaintiff); As to: Geri Care IV, LLC (Defendant); Unified Care Services, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketDeclaration of Trickina Harlston; Filed by: Willie Harlston, by and through his Successor in Interest, Trickina Harlston (Plaintiff); Trickina Harlston (Plaintiff); As to: Geri Care IV, LLC (Defendant); Unified Care Services, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Willie Harlston, by and through his Successor in Interest, Trickina Harlston (Plaintiff); Trickina Harlston (Plaintiff); As to: Geri Care IV, LLC (Defendant); Unified Care Services, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Willie Harlston, by and through his Successor in Interest, Trickina Harlston (Plaintiff); Trickina Harlston (Plaintiff); As to: Geri Care IV, LLC (Defendant); Unified Care Services, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less