This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2023 at 05:28:55 (UTC).

WILLIE GRAY VS ALLIED UNIVERSAL EXECUTIVE PROTECTION AND INTELLIGENCE SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 WILLIE GRAY filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ALLIED UNIVERSAL EXECUTIVE PROTECTION AND INTELLIGENCE SERVICES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHANIE M. BOWICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1449

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAY WILLIE

Defendants

ALLIED UNIVERSAL EXECUTIVE PROTECTION AND INTELLIGENCE SERVICES INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAURIGUE MICHAEL JOE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

8/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE

8/7/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE

Joint Status Conference Report

8/1/2023: Joint Status Conference Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

6/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

Status Report

5/19/2023: Status Report

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/14/2022

9/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/14/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SUBMITTING ACTION TO BINDING ARBITRATION

9/14/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SUBMITTING ACTION TO BINDING ARBITRATION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

8/26/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIELLE J. VUKOVICH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

8/26/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIELLE J. VUKOVICH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Motion to Compel Arbitration

8/26/2022: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PEGGY GRZYWACZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

8/26/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PEGGY GRZYWACZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

7/15/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/15/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

6/30/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2023
  • Hearing12/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Arbitration scheduled for 12/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketNotice of Continued Status Conference; Filed by: Allied Universal Executive Protection and Intelligence Services, Inc. (Defendant); U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Defendant); As to: WILLIE GRAY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference Re: Arbitration)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Status Conference Re: Arbitration scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 12/07/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Report; Filed by: WILLIE GRAY (Plaintiff); Allied Universal Executive Protection and Intelligence Services, Inc. (Defendant); U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Arbitration scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference Re: Arbitration)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Status Conference Re: Arbitration scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/07/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by: WILLIE GRAY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketAddress for Michael Joe Jaurigue (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephanie M. Bowick in Department 19 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WILLIE GRAY (Plaintiff); As to: Allied Universal Executive Protection and Intelligence Services, Inc. (Defendant); U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Defendant); Does 1 through 50, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WILLIE GRAY (Plaintiff); As to: Allied Universal Executive Protection and Intelligence Services, Inc. (Defendant); U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Defendant); Does 1 through 50, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WILLIE GRAY (Plaintiff); As to: Allied Universal Executive Protection and Intelligence Services, Inc. (Defendant); U.S. Security Associates, Inc. (Defendant); Does 1 through 50, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less