This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2019 at 04:13:58 (UTC).

WILLIAMSBURG NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS RICHARD LOPEZ ET

Case Summary

On 04/23/2018 WILLIAMSBURG NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against RICHARD LOPEZ ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERRY GREEN and STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3179

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERRY GREEN

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Defendants

LDI TRUCKING INC.

GAIO TRUCKING INC.

LI WEI XIONG

LEXMAR DISTRIBUTION INC.

LOPEZ RICHARD

CHEN XUE FANG

LEX HOLDINGS INC.

NG AARRON HON WI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GERTLER JONATHAN E. ESQ.

FIOL DAVID LEE

BRENT JOSEPH PETER

CHEADLE SAMUEL P.

SAELTZER DOUGLAS SENGER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/14/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

6/19/2019: Notice of Ruling

Declaration

7/23/2019: Declaration

Case Management Statement

7/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Declaration

5/30/2019: Declaration

Case Management Statement

5/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Response

4/30/2019: Response

Certificate of Mailing for

4/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

4/15/2019: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

3/29/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

5/17/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/8/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/6/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/4/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

1/22/2019: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for

1/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

1/25/2019: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

1/15/2019: Case Management Statement

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Aarron Hon Wi Ng (Defendant); Xue Fang Chen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Plaintiff's and Defendant's Failure to Appear on 04/15/19) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Plaintiff...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF ANDREW P. MCDEVITT IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PLAINTIFFS' FAILURE TO APPEAR); Filed by Aarron Hon Wi Ng (Defendant); Xue Fang Chen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Aarron Hon Wi Ng (Defendant); Xue Fang Chen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketWILLIAMSBURG NATIONAL'S RESPONSE RE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED APRIL 15, 2019; Filed by Williamsburg National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 04/15/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketMotion for an Order; Filed by Williamsburg National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO DEPOSIT PLAINTIFF'S POLICY FUNDS PURSUANT TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Williamsburg National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER; DECLARATION OF JOHN E. PEER IN SUPPORT OF INTERPLEADER COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less