Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2021 at 05:05:19 (UTC).

WILLIAM VELAZQUEZ VS CITY FIBERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 WILLIAM VELAZQUEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CITY FIBERS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6426

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELAZQUEZ WILLIAM

Defendants

PRIORITY WORKFORCE INC.

CITY FIBERS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN R. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

TELLO GUILLERMO

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/22/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION;)

5/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION;)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S AMENDED PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

5/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S AMENDED PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

5/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S AMENDED PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

5/19/2021: Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S AMENDED PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/9/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT PRIORITY WORKFORCE, INC.S CORRECTED NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO DEFENDANT CITY FIBERS, INC.S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY ACTION

3/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT PRIORITY WORKFORCE, INC.S CORRECTED NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO DEFENDANT CITY FIBERS, INC.S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY ACTION

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO PURPORTED EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY FIBERS, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AND STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION

3/16/2021: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO PURPORTED EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY FIBERS, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AND STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/17/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

3/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE RECEIPT ...)

3/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE RECEIPT ...)

Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO DEFENDANT CITY FIBERS, INC.'S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

3/3/2021: Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO DEFENDANT CITY FIBERS, INC.'S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/18/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Ruling

2/3/2021: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Compel Arbitration

2/4/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Case Management Statement

1/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE RECEIPT ...)

1/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE RECEIPT ...)

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/11/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference (OR Order to Show Cause Re Receipt of Stipulation and Order for Binding Arbitration) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference (OR Order to Show Cause Re Receipt of Stipulation and Order for Binding Arbitration) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order); Filed by Priority Workforce, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketOrder (Granting Defendant's Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action); Filed by City Fibers, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order Regarding Defendant's Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action); Filed by City Fibers, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketOrder (RE: DEFENDANT PRIORITY WORKFORCE, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND AN ORDER DISMISSING ACTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION); Filed by Priority Workforce, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Priority Workforce, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by William Velazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by William Velazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Priority Workforce, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by William Velazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by William Velazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by William Velazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by William Velazquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY FIBERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIORITYWORKFORCE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUNESSI RAMIN RAY