This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2022 at 22:57:05 (UTC).

WILLIAM SARDI, ET AL. VS ALBERT GIBBS, PHD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 WILLIAM SARDI filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ALBERT GIBBS, PHD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4696

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BLACK CHRISTIENNE

SARDI WILLIAM

Defendants

CARFRAE DOROTHY

GIBBS PHD ALBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAYUK CHRISTOPHER WEBB

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

2/8/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

2/8/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/7/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/7/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

2/10/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/7/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by William Sardi (Plaintiff); M. Sardi (Plaintiff); Christienne Black (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by William Sardi (Plaintiff); M. Sardi (Plaintiff); Christienne Black (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by William Sardi (Plaintiff); M. Sardi (Plaintiff); Christienne Black (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by William Sardi (Plaintiff); M. Sardi (Plaintiff); Christienne Black (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYUK CHRISTOPHER WEBB