This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 14:50:15 (UTC).

WILLIAM ROSS, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 WILLIAM ROSS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7737

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DELL'ACQUA NANCY ROSS

HERNANDEZ JOSE J.

HERNANDEZ MARIA R.

HOLLANDER DONALD

HOLLANDER MARILYN

MARTIN ORVILLE RAY

MARTIN PAM

ROSS JOSHUA

ROSS TOM

ROSS WILLIAM

SEMERAU BILL

SEMERAU CHRIS

SEMERAU JOHN

SEMERAU KAREN

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCLEAN ROY WAYNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • Hearing02/15/2022 at 2:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by William Ross (Plaintiff); Nancy Ross Dell'Acqua (Plaintiff); Joshua Ross (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docketat 11:45 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Newly Assigned Case;) of 11/10/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Newly Assigned Case;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Re Complex Determination); Filed by William Ross (Plaintiff); Nancy Ross Dell'Acqua (Plaintiff); Joshua Ross (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:34 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 10/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by William Ross (Plaintiff); Nancy Ross Dell'Acqua (Plaintiff); Joshua Ross (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by William Ross (Plaintiff); Nancy Ross Dell'Acqua (Plaintiff); Joshua Ross (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by William Ross (Plaintiff); Nancy Ross Dell'Acqua (Plaintiff); Joshua Ross (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by William Ross (Plaintiff); Nancy Ross Dell'Acqua (Plaintiff); Joshua Ross (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCLEAN R. WAYNE ESQ.