This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2022 at 08:38:37 (UTC).

WILLIAM RICHARD OSBORN, , ET AL. VS ASBESTOS COMPANIES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 WILLIAM RICHARD OSBORN, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS COMPANIES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3800

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSBORN DEE ANN MAREK

Defendants

3M COMPANY

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

AMCORD INC.

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC.

ASBESTOS COMPANIES

ATWOOD & MORRILL CO. INC. AKA WEIR VALVES AND CONTROLS USA INC.

BAKER HUGHES COMPANY

CHEVRON CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

EXPO INDUSTRIES INC.

FMC CORPORATION AKA NORTHERN PUMP CO.

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY AKA NAPA AUTO PARTS

GREENE TWEED & CO.

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. AKA ALLIED SIGNAL INC./THE BENDIX CORPORATION

IMO INDUSTRIES INC. AKA IMO DELAVAL INC.

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC.

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC.

MECHANICAL DRIVES & BELTINGS AKA L.A. RUBBER COMPANY

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRAIN CECIL B

Defendant Attorneys

AMEELE MELANIE L.

CALARESO CHRISTINE D

LASHINSKY NATALIE G.

PEATMAN STEPHANIE GHANEM

PIETRYKOWSKI MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

9/16/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

9/9/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer - DEFENDANT THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

9/9/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANYS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/9/2022: Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANYS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

9/9/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Demand for Jury Trial

9/9/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

9/9/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer - 3M COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

9/15/2022: Answer - 3M COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - (ASBESTOS) AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/16/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - (ASBESTOS) AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer - DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS; NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

9/16/2022: Answer - DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS; NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/10/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/10/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/17/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/17/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/17/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

8/30/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF DREATH

8/31/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF DREATH

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • Hearing10/06/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by William Richard Osborn, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint for Personal Injury - (Asbestos) and Demand for Jury Trial); Filed by Velan Valve Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDefendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.?s Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury ? Asbestos; Notice of Request for Jury Trial; Filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Docket3M Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint For Damages; Filed by 3M Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDefendant The William Powell Company?s Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by The William Powell Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by The William Powell Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDefendant The William Powell Company?s Answer to Plaintiffs? Complaint for Damages; Filed by The William Powell Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by Armstrong International, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Armstrong International, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by William Richard Osborn, (Plaintiff); Dee Ann Marek Osborn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by William Richard Osborn, (Plaintiff); Dee Ann Marek Osborn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by William Richard Osborn, (Plaintiff); Dee Ann Marek Osborn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by William Richard Osborn, (Plaintiff); Dee Ann Marek Osborn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by William Richard Osborn, (Plaintiff); Dee Ann Marek Osborn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by William Richard Osborn, (Plaintiff); Dee Ann Marek Osborn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by William Richard Osborn, (Plaintiff); Dee Ann Marek Osborn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by William Richard Osborn, (Plaintiff); Dee Ann Marek Osborn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXPO INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENE TWEED & CO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ATWOOD & MORRILL is a litigant