This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2022 at 21:54:34 (UTC).

WILLIAM P. BOAS VS BIG LOTS-PNS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 WILLIAM P BOAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BIG LOTS-PNS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7078

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOAS WILLIAM P.

Defendants

BIG LOTS INC.

BIG LOTS MANAGEMENT LLC

BIG LOTS STORES LLC

BIG LOTS-PNS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENGALI OMAR H

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/19/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

8/19/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

8/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

9/20/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/15/2022

12/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/15/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 12/15/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 12/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by: Big Lots-PNS, LLC (Defendant); Big Lots Management, LLC (Defendant); Big Lots Stores, LLC (Defendant); Big Lots, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: William P. Boas (Plaintiff); As to: Big Lots-PNS, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 08/23/2022; Service Cost: 165.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: William P. Boas (Plaintiff); As to: Big Lots, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 08/23/2022; Service Cost: 50.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: William P. Boas (Plaintiff); As to: Big Lots Stores, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 08/23/2022; Service Cost: 50.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketAddress for Omar H Bengali (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: William P. Boas (Plaintiff); As to: BIG LOTS-PNS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BIG LOTS MANAGEMENT, LLC, an Ohio limited liability company (Defendant); BIG LOTS STORES, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: William P. Boas (Plaintiff); As to: BIG LOTS-PNS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BIG LOTS MANAGEMENT, LLC, an Ohio limited liability company (Defendant); BIG LOTS STORES, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: William P. Boas (Plaintiff); As to: BIG LOTS-PNS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BIG LOTS MANAGEMENT, LLC, an Ohio limited liability company (Defendant); BIG LOTS STORES, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: William P. Boas (Plaintiff); As to: BIG LOTS-PNS, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); BIG LOTS MANAGEMENT, LLC, an Ohio limited liability company (Defendant); BIG LOTS STORES, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIG LOTS F&S INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BIG LOTS STORES INC A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENGALI OMAR H