This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 03:39:59 (UTC).

WILLIAM MICHAEL WEISSMAN VS HANNAH HENDLISH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 WILLIAM MICHAEL WEISSMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HANNAH HENDLISH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9539

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEISSMAN WILLIAM MICHAEL

Defendants

HENDLISH HANNAH

HENDLISH JUDITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEIMANSON ILAN

Defendant Attorney

MACDONALD SCOTT L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/29/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/29/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/2/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/2/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/21/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

10/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

10/29/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/15/2020: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2023
  • Hearing10/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • Hearing04/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Hearing04/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by WILLIAM MICHAEL WEISSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by HANNAH HENDLISH (Defendant); JUDITH HENDLISH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by HANNAH HENDLISH (Defendant); JUDITH HENDLISH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by WILLIAM MICHAEL WEISSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by WILLIAM MICHAEL WEISSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by WILLIAM MICHAEL WEISSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by WILLIAM MICHAEL WEISSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by WILLIAM MICHAEL WEISSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by WILLIAM MICHAEL WEISSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by WILLIAM MICHAEL WEISSMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEIMANSON ILAN ESQ.