This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 21:58:49 (UTC).

WILLIAM MCSHERRY, ET AL. VS A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 WILLIAM MCSHERRY filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9671

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCSHERRY WILLIAM

Defendants

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

HENRY COMPANY LLC

DURO DYNE WEST CORP.

GOULDS PUMPS IPG LLC FKA GOULDS PUMPS INCORPORATED

TOASTMASTERS INTERNATIONAL

VIACOMCBS INC.

PEERLESS INDUSTRIES INC.

EATON CORPORATION [DOE 2]

YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS AS: YORK HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING

CRANE CO.

DURO DYNE CORPORATION

WARREN PUMPS LLC

RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

DUNHAM-BUSH INC.

RAYPACK INC.

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

JOHNSON CONTROLS INC.

THE MARLEY COMPANY LLC DBA SPX SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER WITH THE MARLEY COMPANY

SPX CORPORATION

32 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOEW KEVIN MATHEW

Defendant Attorneys

JACKSON D. MARK

MARTIN NICOLAS PETER

MONROE MONICA W.

NICHOLS STEPHEN MATTHEW

PIETRYKOWSKI MICHAEL J.

POND FRANCIS DENNIS

SCHIRM BARRY RAYMOND

SHARP GARY DAVID

WEGLARZ CLAIRE CHRISTINE

BAILEY BOBBIE R.

ESTRADA MICHAEL JOSEPH

GARRATT JUSTIN E.

HUIE JEREMY DARWIN

BROSAMLE ANTHONY D.

CORLESS THOMAS CONDIE

DAVIS GEOFFREY MARC

DUFFY JOSEPH

EMPTING ERIN NICOLE

Other Attorneys

PRZYBYSZ ERIC

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/2/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/7/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE GROUP RE: WATERS, KRAUS & PAUL)

6/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE GROUP RE: WATERS, KRAUS & PAUL)

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

6/8/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

5/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/20/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/12/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

4/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/22/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/3/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/12/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE GROUP RE: WATERS, KRAUS & PAUL)

5/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE GROUP RE: WATERS, KRAUS & PAUL)

Request for Dismissal

3/10/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/17/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

3/24/2022: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (P-MCSHERRY 20STCV49671))

3/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (P-MCSHERRY 20STCV49671))

295 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 1:46 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (McSherry-20STCV49671)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docketat 1:46 PM in Department 15; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal (McSherry-20STCV49671)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Flowserve US, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Group re: Waters, Kraus & Paul)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by William McSherry (Plaintiff); Pearl Mcsherry (Plaintiff); SPX Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by William McSherry (Plaintiff); Pearl Mcsherry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice); Filed by William McSherry (Plaintiff); Pearl Mcsherry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice); Filed by William McSherry (Plaintiff); Pearl Mcsherry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docketat 1:46 PM in Department 15; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal (McSherry-20STCV49671)) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
318 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDefendant Warren Pumps, LLC's Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Warren Pumps LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Warren Pumps LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by William McSherry (Plaintiff); Pearl Mcsherry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by William McSherry (Plaintiff); Pearl Mcsherry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by William McSherry (Plaintiff); Pearl Mcsherry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DUNHAM-BUSH INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TOASTMASTERS INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where MARLEY COMPANY, THE is a litigant

Latest cases where Peerless Industries, Inc. is a litigant