This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 00:32:52 (UTC).

WILLIAM MARC SALSBERRY, ET AL. VS SHEHZAD PEERMAHOMED, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 WILLIAM MARC SALSBERRY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHEHZAD PEERMAHOMED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1153

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SALSBERRY JOYCE

SALSBERRY WILLIAM MARC

Defendants

PEERMAHOMED SHEHZAD

MANE DECESSUS LLC A WYOMING LLC

MANE DECESSUS INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAMER BRENT ADAM

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

11/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/1/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

12/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/28/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Personal Service

12/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail

1/4/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/13/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULTS

1/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULTS

Case Management Statement

2/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

3/19/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Declaration - CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

3/25/2021: Declaration - CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRENT A. KRAMER REGARDING CALCULATION OF INTEREST

3/25/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BRENT A. KRAMER REGARDING CALCULATION OF INTEREST

Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM MARC SALSBERRY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

3/25/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM MARC SALSBERRY IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Proof of Service by Mail

3/25/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Default Judgment

3/25/2021: Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

3/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Default Judgment) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by William Marc Salsberry (Plaintiff); Joyce Salsberry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by William Marc Salsberry (Plaintiff); Joyce Salsberry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Default Judgment]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by William Marc Salsberry (Plaintiff); Joyce Salsberry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by William Marc Salsberry (Plaintiff); Joyce Salsberry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by William Marc Salsberry (Plaintiff); Joyce Salsberry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by William Marc Salsberry (Plaintiff); Joyce Salsberry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by William Marc Salsberry (Plaintiff); Joyce Salsberry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by William Marc Salsberry (Plaintiff); Joyce Salsberry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by William Marc Salsberry (Plaintiff); Joyce Salsberry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRAMER BRENT ADAM