This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2023 at 11:33:33 (UTC).

WILLIAM LUNNEY VS ZIMMER US, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 WILLIAM LUNNEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against ZIMMER US, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1458

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUNNEY WILLIAM AKA WILLIAM GAYLORD

Defendants

BIOMET INC. AN INDIANA CORPORATION

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KUMAR PRADEEP

ZIMMER BIOMET A DELAWARE CORPORATION

ZIMMER INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

ZIMMER US INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASTOURIAN PARO

Defendant Attorney

BRADFORD THOMAS ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

3/15/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/15/2023: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/14/2023: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/14/2023: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING THE STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND THE ZIMMER DEFENDANTS TO FURTHER EXTEND THE ZIMMER DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE

2/27/2023: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING THE STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND THE ZIMMER DEFENDANTS TO FURTHER EXTEND THE ZIMMER DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; (PROPOSED) ORDER;

2/27/2023: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; (PROPOSED) ORDER;

Answer

2/21/2023: Answer

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; (PROPOSED) ORDER;

2/21/2023: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; (PROPOSED) ORDER;

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND THE ZIMMER DEFENDANTS TO FURTHER EXTEND THE ZIMMER DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE

2/21/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND THE ZIMMER DEFENDANTS TO FURTHER EXTEND THE ZIMMER DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE

Demand for Jury Trial

2/2/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

2/2/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PLAINTIFF AND ZIMMER DEFENDANTS' JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR THE ZIMMER DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

1/17/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PLAINTIFF AND ZIMMER DEFENDANTS' JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR THE ZIMMER DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF WILLIAM LUNNEY AND ZIMMER DEFENDANTS' JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR THE ZIMMER DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF WILLIAM LUNNEY'S COMPLAIN

1/17/2023: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF WILLIAM LUNNEY AND ZIMMER DEFENDANTS' JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR THE ZIMMER DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF WILLIAM LUNNEY'S COMPLAIN

Answer

1/9/2023: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/9/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

12/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, a California corporation (Defendant); Pradeep Kumar (Defendant); As to: William Lunney (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer to First Amended Complaint: Exact Name: Answer to First Amended Complaint ; As To Parties changed from William Lunney (Plaintiff) to William Lunney (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation and Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only; Signed and Filed by: William Lunney (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only: Filed By: William Lunney (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketNotice Plaintiff's Notice of Entry of Order Re: Stipulation for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint; Filed by: William Lunney (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by: William Lunney (Plaintiff); As to: Zimmer US, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Zimmer, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Zimmer Biomet, a Delaware corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- First Amended Complaint: Name Extension: (1st)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Joint Stipulation for Leave for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint; (proposed) Order;: Filed By: William Lunney (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 02/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Joint Stipulation for Leave for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint; (proposed) Order;: Result Date changed from 02/27/2023 to 02/27/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: William Lunney (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/08/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: William Lunney (Plaintiff); As to: Zimmer US, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/08/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: William Lunney (Plaintiff); As to: Biomet, Inc., an Indiana corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/08/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/26/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: William Lunney (Plaintiff); As to: Zimmer US, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Zimmer, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Zimmer Biomet, a Delaware corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: William Lunney (Plaintiff); As to: Zimmer US, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Zimmer, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Zimmer Biomet, a Delaware corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: William Lunney (Plaintiff); As to: Zimmer US, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Zimmer, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Zimmer Biomet, a Delaware corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less