This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 02:25:36 (UTC).

WILLIAM LEMUS VS JOSE OSMIN SERRANO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 WILLIAM LEMUS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE OSMIN SERRANO,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3170

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEMUS WILLIAM

Defendants

JOSE OSMIN SERRANO

SERRANO TRUCKING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BARRETT WILLIAM GEORGE

Other Attorneys

HENDIZADEH JOSEPH JOHNNY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

10/21/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

10/21/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

10/21/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Demand for Jury Trial

10/20/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

10/20/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/20/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Mail

8/31/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Substitution of Attorney

8/22/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint

7/18/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/18/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/18/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/18/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/18/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2024
  • Hearing07/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2024
  • Hearing01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2024
  • Hearing01/02/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Jose Osmin Serrano (Defendant); Serrano Trucking (Defendant); As to: William Lemus (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Jose Osmin Serrano (Defendant); Serrano Trucking (Defendant); As to: William Lemus (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Jose Osmin Serrano (Defendant); Serrano Trucking (Defendant); As to: William Lemus (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jose Osmin Serrano (Defendant); Serrano Trucking (Defendant); As to: William Lemus (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jose Osmin Serrano (Defendant); Serrano Trucking (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Jose Osmin Serrano (Defendant); Serrano Trucking (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: William Lemus (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Osmin Serrano (Defendant); Serrano Trucking (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/02/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: William Lemus (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Osmin Serrano (Defendant); Serrano Trucking (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: William Lemus (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Osmin Serrano (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: William Lemus (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Osmin Serrano (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: William Lemus (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Osmin Serrano (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERRANO TRUCKING is a litigant