This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2023 at 02:06:23 (UTC).

WILLIAM HUGHES III, ET AL. VS CRANE CO., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 WILLIAM HUGHES III, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CRANE CO ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0745

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HUGHES III WILLIAM

HUGHES SHARON

Defendants

CRANE CO.

CALIFORNIA BRAKE & CLUTCH PARTS INC.

CLUTCH MASTERS INDUSTRIES INC.

FOSECO INC.

FOSTER WHEELER LLC FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION

GRINNELL LLC FKA GRINNELL CORPORATION AKA GRINNELL FIRE

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

ITT LLC

JOHNSON'S JEEP

METALCLAD INSULATION LLC

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

O & R FOUR WHEEL DRIVE

PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

RILEY POWER INC.

SANTA FE BRAUN INC.

STAR AUTO PARTS INC.

THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAYTON ALAN RICHARD

Defendant Attorneys

DEJARDIN BRADFORD JOHN

DUFFY JOSEPH

BASSI MARTE J.

LANGBORD PETER BENNETT

GOODRICH CHRISTINA N.

ASPERICUETA ERIKA ROSE

AMEELE KEITH MICHAEL

BAILEY BOBBIE RAE

BAIME COLLEEN ELIZABETH

BARBER STEVEN JOHN

PIETRYKOWSKI MICHAEL J.

SHELDON CHARLES T.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance - DEFENDANT REDCO CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS CRANE CO.S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1/18/2023: Notice of Appearance - DEFENDANT REDCO CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS CRANE CO.S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

Notice - DEFENDANT REDCO CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS CRANE CO.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

1/18/2023: Notice - DEFENDANT REDCO CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS CRANE CO.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DEFENDANT REDCO CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS CRANE CO.S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/29/2022: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DEFENDANT REDCO CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS CRANE CO.S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

Disassociation of Attorney - DISASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY DEFENDANT REDCO CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS CRANE CO.S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

12/29/2022: Disassociation of Attorney - DISASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY DEFENDANT REDCO CORPORATION FORMERLY KNOWN AS CRANE CO.S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP (BRAYTON PURCELL, LLP))

9/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP (BRAYTON PURCELL, LLP))

Request for Dismissal

7/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP (BRAYTON PURCELL, LLP))

5/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP (BRAYTON PURCELL, LLP))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

12/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF DEATH AND REQUEST FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH

12/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF DEATH AND REQUEST FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

1/6/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

1/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SUBSTITUTING SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR DECEASED PLAINTIFF

2/14/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SUBSTITUTING SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR DECEASED PLAINTIFF

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION OF SHARON HUGHES

2/14/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - DECLARATION OF SHARON HUGHES

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SUBSTITUTING SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR DECEASED PLAINTIFF

2/14/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SUBSTITUTING SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR DECEASED PLAINTIFF

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Christina N. Goodrich (Attorney): Organization Name changed from K&L Gates LLP to K&L Gates, LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketAddress for Christina N. Goodrich (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDefendant Redco Corporation Formerly Known as Crane Co.s Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Crane Co. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDefendant Redco Corporation Formerly Known as Crane Co.'s Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel; Filed by: Crane Co. (Defendant); As to: William Hughes III (Plaintiff); Sharon Hughes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance Defendant Redco Corporation Formerly Known As Crane Co.S Notice Of Appearance; Filed by: Crane Co. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketDisassociation of Attorney Defendant Redco Corporation Formerly Known As Crane Co.S Notice Of Withdrawal Of Counsel; Filed by: Crane Co. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference re: Group (BRAYTON PURCELL, LLP))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference re: Group (Brayton Purcell, LLP) scheduled for 09/07/2022 at 01:45 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 15 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by William Hughes III, et al. on 06/02/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by William Hughes III and Sharon Hughes as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: William Hughes III (Plaintiff); Sharon Hughes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketAddress for Alan Richard Brayton (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: William Hughes III (Plaintiff); As to: Crane Co. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: William Hughes III (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David S. Cunningham in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less