This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2023 at 09:05:23 (UTC).

WILLIAM GREEN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, L.L.C, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 WILLIAM GREEN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, L L C, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9545

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREEN AN INDIVIDUAL WILLIAM

Defendants

RILEY AN INDIVIDUAL ROY

THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY L.L.C A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEITMIRZA BRETIL

Defendant Attorney

SMITH TIMOTHY MARK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/20/2022: Complaint

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

12/20/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/20/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

12/20/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

1/18/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2024
  • Hearing12/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2024
  • Hearing06/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2024
  • Hearing06/04/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, L.L.C, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); As to: WILLIAM GREEN, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: WILLIAM GREEN, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, L.L.C, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 01/04/2023; Service Cost: 327.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/04/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WILLIAM GREEN, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, L.L.C, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); ROY RILEY, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WILLIAM GREEN, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, L.L.C, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); ROY RILEY, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WILLIAM GREEN, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, L.L.C, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); ROY RILEY, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: WILLIAM GREEN, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: THE RITZ-CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, L.L.C, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); ROY RILEY, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less