This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2022 at 01:59:29 (UTC).

WILLIAM EPPS VS JESSAME RAZ BERRY P/K/A JESSAME

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 WILLIAM EPPS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against JESSAME RAZ BERRY P/K/A JESSAME. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1821

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EPPS WILLIAM DBA BE RIGHT BACK PRODUCTIONS

Defendants

JESSAME RAZ BERRY P/K/A JESSAME

JESSAME RAZ BERRY

BERRY JESSAME RAZ FKA JESSAME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOWE STEVEN TODD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/27/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/24/2021: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/3/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE AMENDED

3/1/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE AMENDED

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/25/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/25/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

2/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/24/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • Hearing03/08/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Hearing03/08/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by William Epps (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (AMENDED); Filed by William Epps (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by William Epps (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by William Epps (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by William Epps (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by William Epps (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by William Epps (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by William Epps (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by William Epps (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by William Epps (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOWE STEVEN TODD