Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 00:19:52 (UTC).

WILLIAM CROUCH VS CITY OF WEST COVINA ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/21/2017 WILLIAM CROUCH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF WEST COVINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7705

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CROUCH WILLIAM

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

WEST COVINA CITY OF

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BRAL S. SEAN ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

DIAMOND & DRAGOJEVIC LLP

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/26/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/26/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/26/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

6/26/2018: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/24/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

12/21/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE/PREMISE LIABILITY

12/21/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE/PREMISE LIABILITY

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by William Crouch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by William Crouch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Frontier California Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Frontier California Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Frontier California Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Frontier California Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE/PREMISE LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by William Crouch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST COVINA CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where FRONTIER CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant