This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2022 at 15:42:19 (UTC).

WILLARD HAZELTON VS HEALTHEQUITY, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/09/2022 WILLARD HAZELTON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HEALTHEQUITY, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8468

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAZELTON WILLARD

Defendant

HEALTHEQUITY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARARI NEAMA CORY

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/9/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/9/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/9/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/9/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2023
  • Hearing06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketAddress for Neama Cory Barari (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: WILLARD HAZELTON (Plaintiff); As to: HEALTHEQUITY, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WILLARD HAZELTON (Plaintiff); As to: HEALTHEQUITY, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WILLARD HAZELTON (Plaintiff); As to: HEALTHEQUITY, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WILLARD HAZELTON (Plaintiff); As to: HEALTHEQUITY, INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Terry Green in Department 14 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less