Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2021 at 21:48:47 (UTC).

WILIYEM SOLEMANI MASIHI VS WEST HILLS HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 WILIYEM SOLEMANI MASIHI filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against WEST HILLS HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9542

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MASIHI WILIYEM SOLEMANI

Defendant

WEST HILLS HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARAHI JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

3/24/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/11/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2024
  • Hearing03/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • Hearing09/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • Hearing08/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wiliyem Solemani Masihi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wiliyem Solemani Masihi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wiliyem Solemani Masihi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST HILLS HOSPITAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARAHI JONATHON SHAHAB