This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 01:11:51 (UTC).

WILFREDO SALVADOR LEETOY VS FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES (FCA) US LLC

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 WILFREDO SALVADOR LEETOY filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0354

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEETOY WILFREDO SALVADOR

Defendant

FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

YASUZAWA BRIAN TAKEYA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

6/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/24/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/24/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

6/24/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Answer

7/26/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

9/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/24/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/8/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

1/12/2023: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

1/12/2023: Notice of Settlement

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • Hearing05/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Wilfredo Salvador Leetoy (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Mediation and Discovery scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 12/11/2023 at 09:00 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Mediation and Discovery scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 12/11/2023 at 09:00 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ralph C. Hofer in Department D Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed PI Complicated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Wilfredo Salvador Leetoy (Plaintiff); As to: Fiat Chrysler Automobiles (FCA) US LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wilfredo Salvador Leetoy (Plaintiff); As to: Fiat Chrysler Automobiles (FCA) US LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wilfredo Salvador Leetoy (Plaintiff); As to: Fiat Chrysler Automobiles (FCA) US LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less