This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 09:39:52 (UTC).

WIGHT, PAUL A. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 WIGHT, PAUL A - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L., PENNY, BRENDA J. and MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3173

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAY, GUS T.

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BARTON GEORGE P.

Claimant

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Decedent

WIGHT PAUL A.

Interested Party

THE ARTIS LAW FIRM APLC

Other

SORRENTINO CHRISTOPHER

Not Classified By Court

WALLACE MARGARET L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MELBY RANDALL

Other Attorney

ARTIS TAB L

 

Court Documents

Order - Final Distribution

8/12/2021: Order - Final Distribution

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order - Petition for Final Discharge

8/13/2021: Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order - Petition for Final Discharge

Receipt - Receipt for Distribution

8/13/2021: Receipt - Receipt for Distribution

Minute Order

11/22/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

5/19/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Declaration - Supplement re Letters Testamentary

7/12/2021: Declaration - Supplement re Letters Testamentary

Minute Order

7/20/2021: Minute Order

Inventory & Appraisal - Supplemental

3/2/2021: Inventory & Appraisal - Supplemental

Account - Final or Waiver - First And Final Account And Report, Final Distribution.

3/2/2021: Account - Final or Waiver - First And Final Account And Report, Final Distribution.

Inventory & Appraisal - Final PTC

11/12/2020: Inventory & Appraisal - Final PTC

Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim

9/29/2020: Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim

Notice - Administration to Creditors

9/29/2020: Notice - Administration to Creditors

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

9/17/2020: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Minute Order

9/14/2020: Minute Order

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

9/14/2020: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Will - Admitted

9/14/2020: Will - Admitted

Creditor's Claim

7/8/2020: Creditor's Claim

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketReceipt (Receipt for Distribution ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order (Petition for Final Discharge ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketOrder - Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Account - Final or Waiver filed on March 2, 2021 by George P. Barton. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Supplement re Letters Testamentary ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketWill (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketWill Deposited (3 pgs - Dated - 04/12/2006 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice; Filed by Beneficiary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTIS TAB L. ESQ.