This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2023 at 09:25:22 (UTC).

WHITELY, MADISON VS WHITELY, LEEVAL TREVOR

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 WHITELY, MADISON filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against WHITELY, LEEVAL TREVOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STREIMER, LAURA and KIM, GIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1870

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STREIMER, LAURA

KIM, GIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WHITELY MADISON

Respondent

WHITELY LEEVAL TREVOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THOMAS KENDRA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/23/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

12/2/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

12/2/2022: Minute Order

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - #12 CORRECTED ON 11/10/22

10/7/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - #12 CORRECTED ON 11/10/22

Mail - Certificate of Mailing

11/10/2022: Mail - Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order

11/1/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

11/1/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

10/28/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

10/28/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

10/28/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 (Appearances)

10/24/2022: Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 (Appearances)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

10/7/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declarations)

10/7/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declarations)

Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing - Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Notices)

10/7/2022: Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing - Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Notices)

Declaration - Declaration (Declarations)

10/7/2022: Declaration - Declaration (Declarations)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

10/7/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Order - Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

10/7/2022: Order - Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders)

10/7/2022: Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department L, Streimer, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department L, Kim, Gia, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketMail - Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department L, Kim, Gia, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Notices) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation) (DV w/ Minor Child ??? New Case Petition (Petitions) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (#12 CORRECTED ON 11/10/22 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less