This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2023 at 01:01:46 (UTC).

WHITELY, KINSLEY VS WHITELY, LEEVAL TREVOR

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 WHITELY, KINSLEY filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against WHITELY, LEEVAL TREVOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KIM, GIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1871

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KIM, GIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WHITELY KINSLEY

Respondent

WHITELY LEEVAL TREVOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THOMAS KENDRA

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declarations)

10/7/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declarations)

Declaration - Declaration (Declarations)

10/7/2022: Declaration - Declaration (Declarations)

Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing - Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Notices)

10/7/2022: Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing - Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Notices)

Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders)

10/7/2022: Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order - Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders)

Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing - Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing (Orders)

10/7/2022: Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing - Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing (Orders)

Declaration - Declaration (Declarations)

10/7/2022: Declaration - Declaration (Declarations)

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation) - DV w/ Minor Child ??? New Case Petition (Petitions)

10/7/2022: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation) - DV w/ Minor Child ??? New Case Petition (Petitions)

Order - Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

10/10/2022: Order - Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

10/10/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

10/10/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

10/28/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Minute Order

11/1/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

11/1/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

12/2/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

12/2/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department L, Kim, Gia, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department L, Kim, Gia, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Child

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing (Proposed Form 130 - Restraining Order After Hearing (Orders) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation) (DV w/ Minor Child ??? New Case Petition (Petitions) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing (Notices) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order (Orders) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less