Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 00:10:51 (UTC).

WHITE HORSE RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, INC., A SOUTH CAROLINA CORPORATION VS NATIONWIDE UNIFORM GROUP, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 WHITE HORSE RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, INC , A SOUTH CAROLINA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NATIONWIDE UNIFORM GROUP, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0050

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITE HORSE RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT INC. A SOUTH CAROLINA CORPORATION

Defendants

NATIONWIDE UNIFORM GROUP INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MJ UNIFORM GROUP INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JAVIER ROBERT AKA BOBBY JAVIER

GLOBAL WEAR ENTERPRISES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JAVIER JAMIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CROWDER DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/30/2019: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/26/2019: Complaint

Unknown

2/26/2019: Unknown

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/27/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

2/26/2019: Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by WHITE HORSE RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, INC., a South Carolina corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by WHITE HORSE RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, INC., a South Carolina corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by WHITE HORSE RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, INC., a South Carolina corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by WHITE HORSE RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, INC., a South Carolina corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONWIDE UNIFORM GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CROWDER DOUGLAS