Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 15:30:59 (UTC).

WHITE, DEANNA VS WHITE, MICHAEL J

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 WHITE, DEANNA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against WHITE, MICHAEL J. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are COPS, JENNIFER H. and PACHECO, RANDALL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1050

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

COPS, JENNIFER H.

PACHECO, RANDALL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WHITE DEANNA

Respondent

WHITE MICHAEL J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

BRILLAULT ASHLIE NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Income and Expense

10/8/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

10/8/2020: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Declaration - Income and Expense

10/8/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

8/6/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

FL_General Family Law - FL - Master Template

9/24/2020: FL_General Family Law - FL - Master Template

Minute Order

10/8/2020: Minute Order

Response - Domestic Violence

10/6/2020: Response - Domestic Violence

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

9/17/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

9/17/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

9/17/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Service

9/1/2020: Proof of Service

Minute Order

8/27/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

8/27/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

8/6/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

8/6/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

8/6/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

8/6/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S14, Cops, Jennifer H., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketRequest - Renew Restraining Order (Form 700) (Rejected ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S14, Cops, Jennifer H., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S16, Pacheco, Randall, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRILLAULT ASHLIE N.