This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 19:50:49

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by WHITACRE, ERIC against PLITMANN, HILA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXX7976
  • Filing Date 12/05/2017
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge WEINTRAUB, DEBRE KATZ
  • Courthouse Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Respondent PLITMANN HILA
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Petitioner WHITACRE ERIC
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner
  • 12/06/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner
  • 12/06/2018
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers; Filed by Petitioner
  • 12/06/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner
  • 11/15/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (signed by Gretchen W. Taylor, Judge Pro Tem ); Filed by Petitioner
  • 10/31/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner
  • 10/31/2018
  • Notice - Change of Address; Filed by Respondent
  • 10/31/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent
  • 09/13/2018
  • at 9:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Dept. - 1, Weintraub, Debre Katz, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Granted - Order Signed & Filed
  • 09/13/2018
  • Stipulation and Order (for Appointment of Temporary Judge ); Filed by Petitioner
  • 09/13/2018
  • Minute Order
  • 09/11/2018
  • Stipulation and Order (RE: for Appointment of Temporary Judge ); Filed by Petitioner
  • 01/09/2018
  • Declaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent
  • 01/09/2018
  • Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent
  • 01/09/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner
  • 12/05/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner
  • 12/05/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner
  • 12/05/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner
  • 12/05/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.