This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2023 at 06:23:55 (UTC).

WHEATON LAW GROUP, INC., ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 WHEATON LAW GROUP, INC , filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4978

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALIGNED STRATEGIES LLC

AMRITT VENTURES INC.

BAGLA AVIRAL GOEL

GOTTLIEB LENA VICTORIA

MAGLENA PROPERTIES LLC

WHEATON LAW GROUP INC.

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOX DAVE

Defendant Attorneys

FLIGOR CRAIG A.

HUESTON JOHN C.

RECK BELYNDA BRIDGELAND

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: VON OEYEN HOUSEHOLD; ORDER TO SHOW CAUS...)

5/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: VON OEYEN HOUSEHOLD; ORDER TO SHOW CAUS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

3/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

3/17/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ST...)

1/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ST...)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

1/6/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

1/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

12/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

12/14/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

12/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

12/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE STAY ON DISCOVERY SHOULD NOT ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [21SMCV01768]; F...)

11/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [21SMCV01768]; F...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

10/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER OF BAKLA...)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2023
  • Hearing06/30/2023 at 2:00 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference Re: Von Oeyen Household; Order to Show Caus...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 04/26/2023 at 03:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Trailed was rescheduled to 05/01/2023 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 03:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 04/26/2023 03:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Why the St...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Wheaton Law Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Maglena Properties LLC (Plaintiff); Aviral Goel Bagla (Plaintiff); Amritt Ventures Inc. (Plaintiff); Aligned Strategies LLC (Plaintiff); Lena Victoria Gottlieb (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Wheaton Law Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Maglena Properties LLC (Plaintiff); Aviral Goel Bagla (Plaintiff); Amritt Ventures Inc. (Plaintiff); Aligned Strategies LLC (Plaintiff); Lena Victoria Gottlieb (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less