Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2018 at 00:18:42 (UTC).

WFM FACILITIES MANAGEMENT VS DOMINGUEZ INVESTMENT COMPANY LL

Case Summary

On 11/14/2017 WFM FACILITIES MANAGEMENT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DOMINGUEZ INVESTMENT COMPANY LL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3619

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WFM FACILITIES MANAGEMENT

Defendant and Respondent

DOMINGUEZ INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ADAMSON R. JEREMY

ADAMSON ROBERT JEREMY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ORLAND JAMES J. ESQ.

ORLAND JAMES JOHN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/26/2018: Minute Order

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/2/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

2/26/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

2/27/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/20/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

11/14/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT 2) UNJUST ENRICHMENT

11/14/2017: COMPLAINT FOR 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT 2) UNJUST ENRICHMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; (Trial) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension) (Plaintiff and Defendants' Failure to Appear up to and including potential terminating sanctions/dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by WFM Facilities Management (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of 10/26/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-02-27 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by WFM Facilities Management (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Dominguez Investment Company, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by WFM Facilities Management (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR 1) BREACH OF CONTRACT 2) UNJUST ENRICHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOMINGUEZ INVESTMENT COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMSON R. JEREMY