This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 20:04:23 (UTC).

WFG NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPLANY, A SOUTH CAROLINA CORPORATION, AS SUBROGEE OF THE ENTRUST GROUP INC. FBO IRA JUDITH E. VS A PLUS MAJESTIC INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2020 WFG NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPLANY, A SOUTH CAROLINA CORPORATION, AS SUBROGEE OF THE ENTRUST GROUP INC FBO IRA JUDITH E filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against A PLUS MAJESTIC INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3156

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WFG NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPLANY A SOUTH CAROLINA CORPORATION AS SUBROGEE OF THE ENTRUST GROUP INC. FBO IRA JUDITH E. PERLSTEIN IRA #00394

WFG NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ENRIQUEZ JESSE A.

A PLUS MAJESTIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MARTINEZ ANDRES

A PLUS MAJESTIC INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MARTINEZ ANDRES

SYNERGY INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SYNERGY INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC

Not Classified By Court

MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VESTERDAHL MATTHEW S.

GRANGER CATHY LYNN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MARSHALL WAYNE STANTON

VIJAYRAGHAVAN VASU

CHAPPARS MIKE

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

VIJAYRAGHAVAN VASU

Not Classified By Court Attorney

SWAN BARRY RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

3/17/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Order - ORDER - COURT'S ORDER ON MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON THE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS-DEFENDANTS ANDRES MARTINES AND SYNERGY INVESTMENT PARTNERS

3/3/2021: Order - ORDER - COURT'S ORDER ON MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON THE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS-DEFENDANTS ANDRES MARTINES AND SYNERGY INVESTMENT PARTNERS

Substitution of Attorney

12/31/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Motion re: - MOTION RE: VACATE DEFAULT

11/5/2020: Motion re: - MOTION RE: VACATE DEFAULT

Substitution of Attorney

10/29/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Order

10/14/2020: Case Management Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

10/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/14/2020

10/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 10/14/2020

Case Management Statement

10/7/2020: Case Management Statement

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

9/1/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

9/3/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Proof of Personal Service

9/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

8/6/2020: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/13/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

7/13/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/13/2020: Cross-Complaint

Complaint

4/2/2020: Complaint

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • Hearing06/06/2022 at 11:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 11:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Hearing10/28/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Hearing06/04/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Hearing05/06/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Andres Martinez (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion to Vacate (Default on Cross-Complaint, Filed by Cross-Defendant Andres Martinez;) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Vacate Default on Cross-Complaint, Filed...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOrder (- Court's ORDER on Motion for an Order to Vacate and Set Aside Default on the Cross-Complaint Filed By Cross-Defendants Andres Martines and Synergy Investment Partners); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (of Defendant A Plus Majestic, Inc.;) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Wfg National Title Insurance Company, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Wfg National Title Insurance Company, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Wfg National Title Insurance Company, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Wfg National Title Insurance Company, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Wfg National Title Insurance Company, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Wfg National Title Insurance Company, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Wfg National Title Insurance Company, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Wfg National Title Insurance Company, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WFG NATIONAL TITLE INSURANCE COMPLANY A SOUTH CAROLINA CORPORATION AS SUBROGEE OF THE ENTRUST GROUP INC. FBO IRA JUDITH E. PERLSTEIN IRA #00394 is a litigant

Latest cases where SYNERGY INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant