This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2021 at 17:07:52 (UTC).

WESTROCK VS AQUAHYDRATE, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 WESTROCK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AQUAHYDRATE, INC , A NEVADA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1377

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTROCK

Defendant

AQUAHYDRATE INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRODKIN ALAN L.

Defendant Attorney

KRAS ELVIRA RUSLAN

Other Attorneys

BRODKIN ALAN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 06/30/2021

6/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 06/30/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

6/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; PROPOSED ORDER

3/8/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; PROPOSED ORDER

Notice of Settlement

3/31/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/01/2021

4/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/01/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/13/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 06/30/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by WESTROCK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation And Request To Extend Deadline To Respond To Complaint; Proposed Order); Filed by AQUAHYDRATE, INC., a Nevada corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by WESTROCK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by WESTROCK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by WESTROCK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WestRock California, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Aquahydrate Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRODKIN ALAN