Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2019 at 00:13:33 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC VS KENZIE MOTORS INC, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2019 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KENZIE MOTORS INC, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7974

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

KENZIE MOTORS INC A CORPORATION

MOORE EZEKIEL JR.

MOORE EZEKIEL JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YADEGARI ARASH

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

6/3/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

6/3/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/3/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail

6/3/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order

6/5/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/18/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

3/8/2019: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/8/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Westlake Services, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YADEGARI ARASH