Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 16:24:48 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS NEWPORT BEACH MOTOR COMPANY, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEWPORT BEACH MOTOR COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3248

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendants

NORMAN CHRISTOPHER AKA CHRISTOPHER JOHN NORMAN

NEWPORT BEACH MOTOR COMPANY LLC AKA NEWPORT BEACH MOTOR COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREED KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/7/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • Hearing08/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Westlake Services, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant