Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 19:12:28 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS KEAUGHN, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KEAUGHN, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3028

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendants

KEAUGHN LLC DBA KEAUGHN

CAVER KEAUGHN AKA KEAUGHN L CAVER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREED KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

4/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/6/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE SERVICES LLC DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant