Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2021 at 08:26:12 (UTC).

WESTLAKE FLOORING COMPANY, LLC, VS JOSALAN, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 WESTLAKE FLOORING COMPANY, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSALAN, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6042

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE FLOORING COMPANY LLC DBA WESTLAKE FLOORING SERVICES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

JOSALAN LLC DBA CAR CITY

LANZA SALVATORE JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P ESQUIRE

FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

4/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

3/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSHUA P. FRIEDMAN RE: SERVICE OF PROCESS DILIGENCE

2/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSHUA P. FRIEDMAN RE: SERVICE OF PROCESS DILIGENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

1/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

12/14/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/19/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/19/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/21/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • Hearing06/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Hearing06/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to Defendants Josalan, LLC and Salvatore Joseph Lanza) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to Defendants Josalan, LLC and Salvatore Joseph Lanza) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF JOSHUA P. FRIEDMAN RE: SERVICE OF PROCESS DILIGENCE); Filed by Westlake Flooring Company, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Westlake Flooring Company, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to Defendants Josalan, LLC and Salvatore Joseph Lanza) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Westlake Flooring Company, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Westlake Flooring Company, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Westlake Flooring Company, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOSALAN LLC DBA CAR CITY is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTLAKE FLOORING COMPANY LLC DBA WESTLAKE FLOORING SERVICES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDMAN JOSHUA P