Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 04:18:38 (UTC).

WESTLAKE FLOORING COMPANY LLC VS ICON MOTORING INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 WESTLAKE FLOORING COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ICON MOTORING INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0075

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

WESTLAKE FLOORING COMPANY LLC

WESTLAKE FLOORING SERVICES

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

STABILE JOSH

ICON MOTORING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KIM FRANK ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/15/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

2/22/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

2/26/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

3/20/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/20/2018: Minute Order

ORDER GRANTING AUTHORIZATION TO USE COPY IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

3/20/2018: ORDER GRANTING AUTHORIZATION TO USE COPY IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/20/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DECLARATION OF JOHN SCHWARTZ IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ? 585(D)

3/20/2018: DECLARATION OF JOHN SCHWARTZ IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ? 585(D)

DECLARATION OF JOHN SCHWARTZ TO ACCEPT COPY IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

3/20/2018: DECLARATION OF JOHN SCHWARTZ TO ACCEPT COPY IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

JUDGMENT

3/20/2018: JUDGMENT

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

11/28/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/30/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

10/18/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT, ETC

10/18/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT, ETC

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by WESTLAKE FLOORING COMPANY LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Finding in favor of Plaintiff) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Default Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • ORDER GRANTING AUTHORIZATION TO USE COPY IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-03-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DECLARATION OF JOHN SCHWARTZ TO ACCEPT COPY IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by WESTLAKE FLOORING COMPANY LLC (Plaintiff); WESTLAKE FLOORING SERVICES (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by WESTLAKE FLOORING COMPANY LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by WESTLAKE FLOORING COMPANY LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE FLOORING COMPANY LLC DBA WESTLAKE FLOORING SERVICES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM FRANK ESQ.