This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 19:20:15 (UTC).

WESTFIELD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS CAMPER ATLANTIC CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 WESTFIELD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAMPER ATLANTIC CORP , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5618

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTFIELD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

CAMPER ATLANTIC CORP. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KORMAN GREGORY S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

7/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

10/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Settlement

10/8/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

10/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 10/08/2021

10/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 10/08/2021

Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

10/13/2021: Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • Hearing12/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of OSC (Name Extension) (Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)); Filed by Westfield Property Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Docketat 11:53 AM in Department 40; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Westfield Property Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 10/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Westfield Property Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Westfield Property Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Westfield Property Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Westfield Property Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Westfield Property Management LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTFIELD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KORMAN GREGORY S.