This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 08:07:46 (UTC).

WESTERN SAGES FOUNDATION VS LAN HUA KU

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 WESTERN SAGES FOUNDATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LAN HUA KU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0984

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN SAGES FOUNDATION

Defendant

KU LAN HUA DBA BETHEL DAY CARE CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

BAYLEY GUY RICHARD

TATONE MICHELANGELO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/29/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/16/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Answer

9/15/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • Hearing02/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Hearing11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lan Hua Ku (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Western Sages Foundation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Western Sages Foundation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Western Sages Foundation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYLEY GUY RICHARD